VA SB682 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary detention; alternative custody. Provides that if the facility indicated on a temporary detention order is a state facility, no bed for the person detained or in custody pursuant to the temporary detention order is immediately available at such state facility, and an employee or designee of such state facility is available to take custody of such person, such employee or designee of the state facility may assume custody of such person wherever such person is located and maintain custody of such person and transport such person to such state facility or to an alternative facility of temporary detention. The bill also provides that a person who is an inmate who is subject to an order authorizing treatment shall remain in law-enforcement custody at all times prior to admission to the facility designated for treatment of the person pursuant to such order.
Title
Temporary detention; alternative custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105860D-S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103613D |
Same As/Similar To
SB268 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
SB268 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
SB268 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)