VA SB68 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; industrial building rehabilitation tax credit. Creates a tax credit, not to exceed $100,000, for businesses that rehabilitate or retrofit older industrial buildings in which a new business is located for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2013.
Title
Income tax, corporate; creates industrial building rehabilitation tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100750D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |