VA SB678 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Social Services; central registry; electronic requests and responses. Allows requests for and responses to searches of the central registry of founded complaints of child abuse and neglect maintained by the Department of Social Services to be sent electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central registry; electronic requests and responses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
2020-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB678ER)
2020-02-26SenateEnrolled
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103026D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221296.4(n/a)See Bill Text
6321515(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback