VA SB677 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Performance review of state agencies. Requires that the Office of the State Inspector General conduct a performance review of each executive branch agency at least every four years. The effective date of the bill is July 1, 2014.
Title
State Inspector General, Office of; performance review of state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104305D | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |