VA SB674 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Election day voter registration; pilot program. Requires the State Board of Elections to develop a pilot program for election day voter registration, by which a person who (i) offers to vote on election day but is not a registered voter, (ii) provides one of the allowable forms of identification specified by law, and (iii) provides proof of his residency, in a form specified by the State Board for this purpose, in the precinct in which he offers to vote, shall be permitted to register to vote and to cast a ballot. The bill provides a process by which the validity of such votes is determined. The bill requires participating localities to provide information on the implementation of the pilot program in its locality to the State Board by December 1 of each year in which it participates. The bill requires the State Board to submit a report on the pilot program to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the House and Senate Committees on Privileges and Elections, including a recommendation as to whether there should be statewide election day voter registration. The bill has an expiration date of December 31, 2020.
Title
Election day voter registration; State Board of Elections to develop a pilot program, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103071D |