VA SB669 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Continued to 2017 in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Continued to 2017 in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Highway maintenance payments; bicycle lanes. Provides that cities and towns that receive highway maintenance payments from the Commonwealth based on moving-lane miles of highway will not have such payments reduced if moving-lane miles of highway are converted to bicycle-only lanes, provided that the number of moving-lane-miles is not more than 50 moving-lane-miles or 3% of the municipality's total number of moving-lane-miles, whichever is less. Municipalities will not receive additional funds and cannot reduce their funding of road and street maintenance after a conversion. The bill also repeals the provision that allowed City of Richmond to convert 20 moving-lane-miles to bicycle-only lanes.
Title
Highway maintenance payments; bicycle lanes.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Alexander [D] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] |
Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Continued to 2017 in Transportation |
2016-03-10 | House | Pursuant to House Rule 22 |
2016-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2016-03-10 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105945D-H1 |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104453D |