VA SB657 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exclusion of records related to public safety. Excludes from mandatory disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act information held by the Virginia Commercial Space Flight Authority that is categorized as classified or sensitive but unclassified, including national security, defense, and foreign policy information, provided that such information is exempt under the federal Freedom of Information Act (5 U.S.C. ?§552).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Va. FOIA; exclusion of information related to Va. Commercial Space Flight Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB657ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House (93-Y 3-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #1
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104556D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback