VA SB650 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Political contributions and gifts; prohibition in connection with the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund. Provides that the Governor, his campaign committee, and any political action committee established on his behalf shall not knowingly solicit or accept a contribution, gift, or other item with a value greater than $50 from persons and entities seeking loans or grants from the Fund. The bill also restricts such gifts and contributions from persons and entities seeking loans or grants from the Fund. The bill provides that any violation shall result in a civil penalty of $500 or up to two times the amount of the contribution or gift, whichever is greater.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; political contributions and gifts, prohibited conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB650ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title replaced 14105139D-H1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB650H1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105139D-H1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105139D-H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103395D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1212 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor