VA SB65 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Voter identification; repeal of photo identification requirements; additional forms of identification accepted; signed statement in lieu of required form of identification; penalty. Removes the requirement that voters show a form of identification containing a photograph in order to be allowed to vote. The bill requires a voter to show either his voter registration confirmation documents; his valid Virginia driver's license, his valid United States passport, or any other identification issued by the Commonwealth, one of its political subdivisions, or the United States; any valid student identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth or any private school located in the Commonwealth; any valid student identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in any other state or territory of the United States; any valid employee identification card containing a photograph of the voter and issued by an employer of the voter in the ordinary course of the employer's business; or a copy of a current utility bill, bank statement, government check, paycheck, or other government document that shows the name and address of the voter. The bill also provides that the expiration date on a Virginia driver's license is not considered when determining the validity of a driver's license offered for voter identification purposes. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification when offering to vote is required to sign a statement that he is the named registered voter he claims to be in order to be permitted to cast a ballot. Such statement is signed subject to felony penalties for making false statements, punishable as a Class 5 felony. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification and does not complete or sign the statement shall be offered a provisional ballot according to the provisions of current law. The bill adds language regarding identification requirements for certain voters pursuant to the federal Help America Vote Act of 2002.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter identification; repeal of photo identification requirements, signed statement in lieu of form.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1065)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1065 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB65ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Lindsey, Simon, Robinson
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Locke, Ebbin, Peake
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate acceded to request (22-Y 18-N)
2020-03-02HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-02HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB65H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108457D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108457D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-04SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB65S2
2020-02-03SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 20107007D-S2
2020-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20106752D-S1
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-31SenateFloor substitute printed 20107007D-S2 (Surovell)
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106752D-S1
2020-01-28SenateIncorporates SB123 (Barker)
2020-01-28SenateIncorporates SB113 (Deeds)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-11-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101202D

Same As/Similar To

SB113 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB123 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242404(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242643(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text
242701.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB65&201+sum+SB65
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB65+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB65S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB65S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB65H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB65ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1065+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0075+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0244SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0304SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0313SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0314SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1801V0042+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H18V0126+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1513+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1226SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1426SB0065+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1966+SB0065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1757SB0065+SB0065

Bill Comments

feedback