VA SB642 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Availability of basic health insurance. Authorizes health maintenance organizations to offer and sell to small employers group health care plans for health care services that do not include all of the state-mandated health insurance benefits. Currently, such limited coverage may be offered by health insurers and corporations providing policies, subscription contracts, or evidence of coverage.
Title
Health insurance, basic; HMOs to offer plans that do not include state-mandated benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB642ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Speaker ruled Substitute by Delegate Marshall, R.G. not germane 10105830D-H1 | |
2010-03-04 | House: Floor substitute printed 10105830D-H1 (Marshall, R.G.) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB642S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104798D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104798D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104254D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |