VA SB64 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Paramilitary activities; penalty. Provides that a person is guilty of unlawful paramilitary activity if such person brandishes a firearm or any air-operated or gas-operated weapon or any object similar in appearance while assembled with one or more persons for the purpose of and with the intent to intimidate any person or group of persons. Such unlawful paramilitary activity is punishable as a Class 5 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paramilitary activities; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB64ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateTitle replaced 20109031D-H1
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 47-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB64H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109031D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109031D-H1
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB64S1
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106379D-S1
2020-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-05SenateRead second time
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106379D-S1
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101207D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182433.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB64&201+sum+SB64
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB64+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB64S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB64H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB64ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0601+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0189+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0333SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0366SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0193+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0405+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1852+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1572SB0064+SB0064

Bill Comments

feedback