VA SB64 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Castle doctrine. Encodes a version of the "castle doctrine," allowing the use of physical force, including deadly force, by a person in his dwelling against an intruder in the dwelling who has committed an overt act against him or another person who is lawfully in the dwelling, without civil liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Castle doctrine; self-defense and defense of others.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-30 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-01-30 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-01-30 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-01-05 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-01-05 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100719D

Same As/Similar To

SB4 (Similar To) 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18291.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback