VA SB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reckless driving; exceeding speed limit. Raises the threshold for per se reckless driving for speeding from driving in excess of 80 miles per hour to driving in excess of 85 miles per hour. The threshold for per se reckless driving for speeding for driving at or more than 20 miles per hour in excess of the speed limit remains unchanged. The bill also provides that any person who drives a motor vehicle at a speed in excess of 80 miles per hour but below 86 miles per hour on any highway in the Commonwealth having a maximum speed limit of 65 miles per hour shall be subject to an additional fine of $100.
Title
Reckless driving; raises threshold for speeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 445 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB63ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title replaced 20108444D-H1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB63H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108444D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108444D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (9-Y 6-N) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100801D |
Same As/Similar To
HB885 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)