VA SB63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; solicitation of absentee ballot applications or ballots. Makes it unlawful for anyone to solicit, in person, absentee ballot applications or ballots from individuals in any hospital, nursing home, or assisted living facility. The prohibition does not apply to family members or to general or assistant registrars, electoral board members, or their staffs. A violation of the section is a Class 1 misdemeanor under § 24.2-1017.
Title
Absentee ballot applications; unlawful to solicit in person from individuals in any hospital, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101355D |
Same As/Similar To
HB61 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections