VA SB629 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sanitation districts; commission expenses. Provides that members of sanitation district commissions may be paid a reasonable per diem not to exceed $1,500 annually.
Title
Sanitation districts; commission expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB629ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House (74-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-21 | House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Local Government | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103938D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors