VA SB624 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Conditional release of geriatric prisoners. Allows any person serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction for a felony offense, other than a Class 1 felony, who (i) is 55 years of age or older and has served at least 15 years of the sentence imposed or (ii) is 50 years of age or older and has served at least 20 years of the sentence imposed, to petition the Parole Board for conditional release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Geriatric prisoners; conditional release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-03SenatePending question, not ordered (16-Y 24-N)
2020-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-17SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105021D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192297.1(n/a)See Bill Text
53140.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback