VA SB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Artificial Intelligence; report; sunset. Creates the Commission on Artificial Intelligence to advise the Governor on issues related to artificial intelligence and make advisory recommendations based on its findings. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2027.
Title
Artificial Intelligence, Commission on; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105043D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports