VA SB621 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; energy efficiency data for state-owned buildings. Provides for the Department of General Services to establish a program requiring an energy analysis of each state-owned building containing more than 50,000 square feet of usable space to identify opportunities for reduced energy use. By December 31, 2012, such buildings are required to obtain an energy efficiency score utilizing the Energy Star assessment and ratings program. The Energy Star score will be published on the Department's website and updated annually.
Title
State-owned buildings; DGS to establish program requiring energy efficiency data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 12104183D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Energy Conservation and Resources
Property, Grounds, and Buildings, State-owned
Energy Conservation and Resources
Property, Grounds, and Buildings, State-owned