VA SB611 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Automated sales suppression device; penalties. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to willfully utilize any device or software to falsify the electronic records of cash registers or manipulate transaction records that affect any state or local tax liability. The bill provides that any violation shall result in a civil penalty of $20,000.
Title
Automated sales suppression devices; falsifying electronic records, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 723 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB611ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 14105437D-S1 |
2014-03-03 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-02-26 | House | Delegates: Albo, Villanueva, Keam |
2014-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Saslaw, McEachin, Wagner |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB611H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105231D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Constitutional readings dispensed (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105231D-H1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (10-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14101322D |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)