VA SB608 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Lifetime concealed handgun permits; Department of State Police to issue; penalty. Provides for the issuance of concealed handgun permits that do not expire to Virginia residents upon payment of a one-time fee of $100, except that the fee for a person currently holding an unexpired permit is $50. Currently, the fee for issuing such permits is $50, and the permits must be renewed every five years with an additional $50 fee charged each time. Such lifetime permits will include a photograph of the permittee. The bill also centralizes the issuance of concealed handgun permits with the Department of State Police; under current law, the circuit court clerk for the jurisdiction where the applicant resides issues such permits. The Department of State Police must issue a permit within 45 business days of receipt of a completed application, unless the applicant is disqualified, and a replacement permit within 30 business days of receipt of a notarized statement from the permittee that the permit was lost or stolen. Permittees must notify the Department of State Police within 30 business days of any change in their address. The bill also requires the Department of State Police to conduct periodic background checks during the lifetime of any permit issued in the Commonwealth, but no less than annually. The bill provides for a process by which a person whose permit application was denied or whose permit was revoked may appeal such determination. The Department of State Police will submit a report containing statistical information regarding the issuance of concealed handgun permits annually to the General Assembly. The bill also requires the Department of State Police to charge a fee of $25 for the issuance of a permit to certain retired non-Virginia law-enforcement personnel (currently no fee is charged), $200 for the issuance of a nonresident permit (currently $100), $10 for the issuance of a replacement permit (currently $10 due to an address change or $5 for a lost or destroyed permit), and $50 for the transference of a nonresident permit into a resident permit. Finally, the bill provides that any person who displays a permit that has been revoked or suspended knowing that such permit has been revoked or suspended is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and is guilty of a Class 6 felony if he is simultaneously in possession of a concealed handgun. The bill does not alter current penalties for carrying a concealed handgun without a permit. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2015.
Title
Concealed handgun permits, lifetime; Department of State Police to issue, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-28 | House | Continued to 2015 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB608S1 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stuart withdrawn |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB608S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104403D-S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104403D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103717D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 3-08.018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |