VA SB607 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Summary
Definitions; towing and recovery operator. Excludes a franchised motor vehicle dealer using a tow truck owned by a dealer when transporting a vehicle to or from a repair facility owned by the dealer when the dealer does not receive compensation from the vehicle owner for towing of the vehicle or when transporting a vehicle in which the dealer has an ownership or security interest from the definition of "towing and recovery operator."
Title
Towing and recovery operator; definition excludes franchised motor vehicle dealer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB607ER) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 080583328-E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB607E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080583328 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB607 |