VA SB605 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elementary and secondary schools; sexual misconduct. Requires the Department of Education and local school boards to adopt policies to implement the provisions of federal law that prohibit any local school board or any individual who is an employee, contractor, or agent of a local school board from assisting an employee, contractor, or agent of such local school board in obtaining a new job if such local school board or individual knows or has probable cause to believe that the employee, contractor, or agent engaged in sexual misconduct regarding a minor or student in violation of law. This bill is identical to HB 438.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards, local, etc.; prohibits assisting person for new job if engaged in misconduct w/minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB605ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateTitle replaced 18107512D-H1
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB605H1
2018-03-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107512D-H1
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107512D-H1
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB605S1
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute by Senator Stanley agreed to 18107125D-S1
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateFloor substitute printed 18107125D-S1 (Stanley)
2018-02-13SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-12SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-01SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100465D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221296.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB605
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB605+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB605S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB605H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB605ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0514+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0178+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0398SB0605+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0486SB0605+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0488SB0605+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0044+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0173+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1264+SB0605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0962SB0605+SB0605

Bill Comments

feedback