VA SB596 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; state and local license taxes on certain brewery licensees. Imposes a state license tax of $350 and a local license tax of $250 for breweries that manufacture no more than 500 barrels of beer during the licensing year.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; state and local license tax on certain brewery licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB596ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB596S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104077D-S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104077D-S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103030D |