VA SB590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
License to teach dentistry; foreign dental program graduates. Allows the Board of Dentistry to grant, without examination, a faculty license to teach dentistry in an accredited dental program to a graduate of a dental school or college or the dental department of an institution of higher education in a foreign country that has been granted a certification letter from the dean or program director of an accredited dental program confirming that the applicant has clinical competency and clinical experience that meet the credentialing standards of the dental school with which the applicant is to be affiliated. The provisions of the bill expire on July 1, 2025.
Title
Dentistry; license to teach, foreign dental program graduates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Davis, Coyner, Simonds |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB590ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100987D |