VA SB573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program established. Establishes the Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Emergency Management and financially managed by the Virginia Resources Authority, for the purpose of making loans and awarding grants to local governments for the purpose of assisting with improvement projects relating to public safety radio and communications infrastructure.
Title
Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund; definitions, created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB573S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107165D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107165D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102499D |