VA SB57 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance reports; electronic filing requirement; local and constitutional offices. Requires candidates for local and constitutional offices to file campaign finance reports by computer or electronic means. Under current law, only candidates for local and constitutional offices in localities with a population exceeding 70,000 are required to file campaign finance reports electronically. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Campaign finance reports; electronic filing requirement, local and constitutional offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 769 (effective 1/1/21) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB57ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendment (90-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100810D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 946.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 947.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |