VA SB566 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Report of arrests; fingerprints; trespass; disorderly conduct. Requires that a law-enforcement agency make a report of any arrest of a person for trespassing (?§18.2-119) or disorderly conduct (?§18.2-415) to the Central Criminal Records Exchange and that such report be accompanied by the fingerprints and photograph of the person arrested. Under current law, such a report is required for all other misdemeanors punishable by confinement in jail under Title 18.2 (Crimes and Offenses Generally). This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 1266.
Title
Arrests; law-enforcement agency to report, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 178 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB566ER) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103932D |