VA SB563 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance Act Tax Credit Program. Increases by $500,000 in each of fiscal years 2015 and 2016 the amount of tax credits that may be issued under the tax credit program for both donations supporting education programs and donations supporting other than education programs. After the phase-in is completed, each fiscal year $9 million in tax credits could be issued for donations supporting education programs and $8 million in tax credits could be issued for donations supporting other than education programs. The bill also grants a five-year exemption from current eligibility requirements relating to persons served by the neighborhood organization and the use of the organization's revenues. Only those organizations that received neighborhood assistance tax credits for fiscal year 2011-2012 would benefit from the exemption.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act; increases amount of tax credits that may be issued under program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB563ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Delegates: Jones, Massie, Joannou |
2014-03-04 | House | Second conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Stosch, Hanger, Puckett |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House acceded to request for second conference committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-02-26 | House | Delegates: Jones, Massie, Joannou |
2014-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Stosch, Hanger, Puckett |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB563H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105319D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Constitutional readings dispensed (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105319D-H1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB563S1 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103722D-S1 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103722D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103242D |