VA SB552 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exclusion from mandatory disclosure; names and training records of law-enforcement officers and fire marshals. Provides that the names and training records of law-enforcement officers as defined in § 9.1-101 and fire marshals as defined in § 27-30 shall be considered personnel records and excluded from mandatory disclosure under theVirginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; mandatory disclosure of public employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16105187D-ES1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB552ES1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Cosgrove agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105187D-S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105187D-S1 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #2 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101174D |