VA SB537 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conduct of elections; observers. Requires observers to respect the area around voters and secrecy of the ballot.
Title
Elections; requires observers to respect area around voters and secrecy of ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB537ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB537ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Chair votes yes | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-12 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103125D |
Same As/Similar To
HB319 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)