VA SB535 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-10 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-10 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan; projects to be funded from general fund-supported resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | Senate: Failed to pass in Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: No further action taken | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Putney, Massie, Joannou | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Colgan, Ruff, Hanger | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB535H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105771D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105771D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-12 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103182D |