VA SB521 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Medicaid Fiscal Oversight and Accountability. Creates as an independent state agency the Office of Medicaid Fiscal Oversight and Accountability and charges the agency with the preparation of the Official Medicaid Forecast for the state, monthly oversight of Medicaid expenditures, review of the fiscal impact of policy changes, and other oversight and accountability responsibilities. The bill creates the position of Director of the Office of Medicaid Fiscal Oversight and Accountability, to be appointed by the Governor subject to confirmation by the General Assembly.
Title
Medicaid Fiscal Oversight and Accountability, Office of; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101773D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 323.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 331.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 331.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |