VA SB516 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tolling on interstate highways. Prohibits tolls on any component of interstate highways existing prior to July 1, 2016. The bill provides that if additional lanes are added to an interstate highway, those additional lanes may be tolled. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Tolls; use for additional lanes on interstate highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Incorporated by Transportation |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Trans sub: Tolling |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101817D |
Same As/Similar To
SB295 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation with letter (13-Y 0-N)