VA SB515 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mobile food vending in commuter lots in Planning District 8; fees; security. Allows mobile food vending units to apply for a permit and pay a fee to the Department of Transportation that would allow them to sell food in commuter lots in Planning District 8. The bill requires the Department to establish criteria for the program and a fee for the permit and to publish the permit application form and the established fee for the permit on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile food vending; allows units in commuter lots in Planning District 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 765 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20SenateReenrolled bill text (SB515ER2)
2016-04-20SenateReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N)
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
2016-03-29SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2016-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
2016-03-10SenateSigned by President
2016-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB515ER)
2016-03-08SenateEnrolled
2016-03-07SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-03HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
2016-03-03HousePassed House with amendments (91-Y 6-N)
2016-03-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2016-03-03HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-03-03HouseRead third time
2016-03-02HouseRead second time
2016-03-01HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 2-N)
2016-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2016-02-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2016-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2016-02-05HouseRead first time
2016-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2016-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB515S1
2016-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 16104817D-S1
2016-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-01SenateRead second time
2016-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2016-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 16104817D-S1
2016-01-27SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2016-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2016-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101816D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332118(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB515
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB515+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB515S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB515ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB515ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0765+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S11V0029+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0135SB0515+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0159SB0515+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1902V0044+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H19V0219+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1149+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0885SB0515+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1125SB0515+SB0515
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1447+SB0515

Bill Comments

feedback