VA SB5052 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Creates a special nonreverting fund to be known as the Body-Worn Camera System Fund to assist state or local law-enforcement agencies with the costs of purchasing, operating, and maintaining body-worn camera systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-21HouseReferred from Public Safety by voice vote
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
2020-08-27SenatePrinted as engrossed 20200202D-E
2020-08-27SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB5052E
2020-08-27SenateAmendments by Senator Norment agreed to
2020-08-27SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-08-27SenateRead second time
2020-08-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-17SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200202D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91116.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback