VA SB503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Admissions tax in Washington County. Clarifies that Washington County is authorized to impose an admissions tax to either a multi-sports complex or an entertainment venue, or both, subject to certain requirements. This bill is identical to HB 1553.
Title
Admissions tax; Washington County authorized to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 289 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB503ER) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102080D |