VA SB5 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Education; uniform minimum standards for modern public school buildings. Requires the Board of Education to prescribe by regulation uniform minimum standards for the erection of modern public school buildings and the modernization of existing public school buildings for the purpose of promoting positive educational outcomes for each public elementary and secondary school student. The bill requires such regulations to include uniform minimum modern public school building standards that promote (i) the delivery of instruction that complies with the Standards of Learning by addressing enrollment capacity and available space and (ii) the health and safety of each enrolled student. The bill requires each school board, once every three years, to (a) assess and report to the Board the extent to which each public school building in the local school division complies with such uniform minimum standards and (b) submit to the Board a long-range plan for compliance with such uniform minimum standards, including an assessment of the cost of such compliance, in any case in which the school board determines that a public school building in the local school division does not comply with such standards. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Education; uniform minimum standards modern; public school buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Education with amendment (19-Y 2-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100391D-E
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB5E
2020-02-06SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-06SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-09SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-09SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100391D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221138(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback