VA SB498 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard program. Limits the ability of an electric utility participating in the renewable energy portfolio standard (RPS) program to bank renewable energy sales or renewable energy certificates (RECs) that are in excess of the yearly sales requirement for that RPS Goal. The measure provides that the utility may use such excess sales or RECs to achieve the RPS Goals only in the subsequent five calendar years after the renewable energy was generated or the certificates were created. An electric utility may continue to apply RECs that it acquired prior to January 1, 2014.
Title
Electric utility regulation; renewable energy portfolio standard program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB498ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (88-Y 9-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House (88-Y 9-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House (95-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB498S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104428D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104428D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101772D |
Same As/Similar To
HB822 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)