VA SB495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; jewelry store license. Creates a jewelry store license, which (i) may be granted to a permanent retail establishment in which at least 75 percent of its annual sales come from the sale of jewelry and (ii) authorizes the licensee to serve two five-ounce glasses of wine or two 12-ounce glasses of beer to any bona fide customer. The bill establishes state and local license fees for such license. The bill has a contingent expiration date.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; jewelry store license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104105D-E |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB495E |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104105D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |