VA SB493 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional release of geriatric, terminally ill, or permanently physically disabled prisoners. Provides that any person serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction for a felony offense, other than a Class 1 felony, who is terminally ill or permanently physically disabled is eligible for consideration by the Parole Board for conditional release. The bill also provides that any person serving such sentence (i) who is 65 years or age or older and has served at least five years of the sentence imposed or (ii) who is 60 years of age or older and has served at least 10 years of the sentenced imposed is eligible for consideration by the Parole Board for conditional release without the need to petition the Parole Board.
Title
Geriatric, terminally ill, etc., prisoners; conditional release, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102904D-E |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB493E |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Bell withdrawn |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102904D |