VA SB492 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign search warrants to be honored. Provides that a Virginia corporation or other entity that provides electronic communication services or remote computing services to the general public, when properly served with a warrant and affidavit in support of the warrant, issued by a judicial officer or court of another state with jurisdiction over the matter, to produce a record or other information pertaining to a subscriber to or customer of such service or the contents of electronic communications, or both, shall produce the record or other information as if that warrant had been issued by a Virginia court provided the record, information or communications are related to the commission of a criminal offense that is substantially similar to (i) a violent felony as defined in §17.1-805, (ii) an act of violence as defined in §19.2-297.1, or (iii) any offense for which registration is required pursuant to §9.1-902.
Title
Search warrants, out-of-state; to be honored by State corporation or other entity.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB492ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Title replaced 10105555D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB492H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105555D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105555D-H1 | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101881D-E | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB492E | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101881D |