VA SB487 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Center for Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention; Virginia Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund; creation. Establishes the Virginia Center for Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention (the Center) within the Department of Criminal Justice Services and transfers to the Center the administration of the existing Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund.
Title
Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention, Virginia Center; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Wilt, Cordoza, Bulova |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Lucas, Vogel |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute (61-Y 38-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB487H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107374D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107374D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103607D |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 116.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 194 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |