VA SB479 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health services; obsolete provisions. Removes the requirement that the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services develop and biennially update a six-year Comprehensive State Plan for Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Plan). Since the Plan was initially required in 1998, other reporting requirements have been enacted that have rendered the Plan obsolete. The bill also removes obsolete provisions of the Uniform Act on Adoption and Medical Assistance. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Health services; obsolete provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB479ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101113D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |