VA SB479 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protective orders; possession of firearms; surrender or transfer of firearms; penalty. Prohibits any person subject to a permanent protective order (i.e., a protective order with a maximum duration of two years) from knowingly possessing a firearm while the order is in effect, provided that for a period of 24 hours after being served with a protective order such person may continue to possess such firearm for the purposes of selling or transferring it to any person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm. A violation of this provision is a Class 6 felony. The bill also provides that a court shall order a person subject to a permanent protective order to (i) within 24 hours, surrender any firearm possessed by such person to a designated local law-enforcement agency or sell or transfer any firearm possessed by such person to a dealer or to any person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm and (ii) certify in writing that such person does not possess any firearms or that all firearms possessed by such person have been surrendered, sold, or transferred and file such certification with the clerk of the court that entered the protective order within 48 hours after being served with a protective order. The bill provides that the willful failure of any person to certify in writing that all firearms possessed by such person have been surrendered, sold, or transferred or that such person does not possess any firearms shall constitute contempt of court. The bill provides procedures for designating a local law-enforcement agency to receive and store firearms, as well as a process to return such surrendered firearms. The bill also makes it a Class 4 felony for any person to sell, barter, give, or furnish any firearm to any person he knows is prohibited from possessing or transporting a firearm who is subject to a permanent protective order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders; possession of firearms, surrender or transfer of firearms, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (50-Y 42-N) (Y: 50 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1260)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1260 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB479ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (50-Y 42-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (50-Y 42-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 18-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB479ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02SenateTitle replaced 20108989D-S1
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (56-Y 41-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB479H1
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute by Delegate Mullin agreed to 20108989D-H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee amendment rejected
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseFloor substitute printed 20108989D-H1 (Mullin)
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety with amendment (15-Y 6-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-01-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB479S1
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106476D-S1
2020-01-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-27SenateRead second time
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106476D-S1
2020-01-22SenateIncorporates SB372 (Saslaw)
2020-01-22SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103357D

Same As/Similar To

SB372 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB1004 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1221)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.1:4(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB479&201+sum+SB479
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB479+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB479S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB479H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB479ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB479ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1260+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0072+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0149SB0479+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0205SB0479+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0110+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1501+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1340SB0479+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1976SB0479+SB0479
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2275+SB0479

Bill Comments

feedback