VA SB462 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
Pending: House Education: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; in-state tuition; children of active duty service members or veterans. Provides that any child of an active duty member or veteran who claims Virginia as his home state and filed Virginia tax returns for at least 10 years during active duty service is eligible for in-state tuition charges, regardless of domicile. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; in-state tuition, children of active duty service members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102339D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB462E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102339D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback