VA SB46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain emergency and quarantine orders; additional procedural requirements. Provides that, in any case in which the Governor has issued an emergency order that includes any measure that closes schools or businesses or restricts the movement of healthy persons within the area to which the order applies, all of the rights, protections, and procedures applicable in the case of an order of quarantine issued by the State Health Commissioner shall apply. Certain emergency and quarantine orders; additional procedural requirements. Provides that, in any case in which the Governor has issued an emergency order that includes any measure that closes schools or businesses or restricts the movement of healthy persons within the area to which the order applies, all of the rights, protections, and procedures applicable in the case of an order of quarantine issued by the State Health Commissioner shall apply.
Title
Emergency and quarantine orders, certain; additional procedural requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB46ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (55-Y 42-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (3-Y 37-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB46ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House (53-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB46S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106262D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106262D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100560D |