VA SB451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Dayton. Removes an outdated reference to a council composed of seven members. The town's charter was amended in 2011 to reduce the size of the council from seven to six members. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Dayton, Town of; amending charter, election of council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 3/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB451ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 16101771D |