VA SB451 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of law-enforcement officer; municipal park rangers. Adds sworn municipal park rangers who are conservators of the peace to the definition of law-enforcement officer.
Title
Law-enforcement officer; sworn municipal park rangers added to definition of officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102235D |