VA SB449 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB449

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Abolition of the death penalty. Abolishes the death penalty, including for those persons currently under a death sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death penalty; abolishes penalty, including those persons currently under a death sentence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Judiciary
2020-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105714D-S1
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102063D

Same As/Similar To

SB449 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171310(n/a)See Bill Text
171313(n/a)See Bill Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
18210(n/a)See Bill Text
18217(n/a)See Bill Text
18218(n/a)See Bill Text
18219(n/a)See Bill Text
18222(n/a)See Bill Text
18225(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.01(n/a)See Bill Text
18226(n/a)See Bill Text
18230(n/a)See Bill Text
18231(n/a)See Bill Text
18232(n/a)See Bill Text
1828(n/a)See Bill Text
192100(n/a)See Bill Text
192102(n/a)See Bill Text
19211.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192157(n/a)See Bill Text
192159(n/a)See Bill Text
192163(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.7(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.8(n/a)See Bill Text
192169.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192175(n/a)See Bill Text
192217.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192247(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192270.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192299(n/a)See Bill Text
192299.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192311(n/a)See Bill Text
192319(n/a)See Bill Text
192321.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.11(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192400(n/a)See Bill Text
19271(n/a)See Bill Text
19276.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
531204(n/a)See Bill Text
531229(n/a)See Bill Text
531230(n/a)See Bill Text
531232(n/a)See Bill Text
531236(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.10(n/a)See Bill Text
801654(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback