VA SB44 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Coal tax credits. Limits the aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for the coal employment and production incentive tax credit to $7.3 million in each fiscal year. An electricity generator must file an application with the Department of Taxation each year to determine the amount of credits that it may claim or allocate, including credits earned in prior taxable years. If the total amount of approved applications for tax credits for the fiscal year exceeds $7.3 million, the Department of Taxation shall apportion the credits on a pro rata basis. The bill also extends the sunset date of the coalfield employment enhancement tax credit through taxable years beginning before January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal tax; limits aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for employment, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enriolled form rejected (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N 1-A) (Y: 76 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20SenateRequires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2016-04-20SenateMotion to pass in enriolled form rejected (24-Y 15-N)
2016-04-20SenatePassed by temporarily
2016-03-11 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2016-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
2016-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
2016-03-03SenateSigned by President
2016-02-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-02-29SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB44ER)
2016-02-29SenateEnrolled
2016-02-26SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
2016-02-24HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N 1-A)
2016-02-24HousePassed House with amendments (74-Y 25-N 1-A)
2016-02-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2016-02-24HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-02-24HouseRead third time
2016-02-23HouseRead second time
2016-02-22HouseReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 5-N)
2016-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2016-02-17HouseRead first time
2016-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-15SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2016-02-15SenatePassed by temporarily
2016-02-12SenatePassed by for the day
2016-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB44S1
2016-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 16105340D-S1
2016-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-12SenateRead second time
2016-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-10SenateIncorporates SB718
2016-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105340D-S1
2016-02-10SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2015-12-15SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-12-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101723D

Same As/Similar To

HB298 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB718 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581433.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB44
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB44+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB44S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB44ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S05V0103+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0336SB0044+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0366SB0044+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0422SB0044+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H10V0142+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0862+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0649SB0044+SB0044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1138SB0044+SB0044

Bill Comments

feedback